California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2016

Amended

Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016