Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |