California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2189 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/09/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2189CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 263 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 17, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Irwin (Coauthor: Senator Pavley) FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to add Section 33204.8 to the Public Resources Code, relating to the Santa Monica Mountains Conservancy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2189, Irwin. Rim of the Valley Trail Corridor: boundary revisions. Existing law establishes the Santa Monica Mountains Conservancy in the Natural Resources Agency and prescribes the functions and duties of the conservancy with regard to the preservation, protection, and management of specified lands in the Santa Monica Mountains Zone, as defined. For purposes of providing a recreational trail corridor, the zone includes trails and accessways generally following the Rim of the Valley Trail, as specified. Existing law authorizes the conservancy to revise the boundaries of the Rim of the Valley Trail Corridor in the vicinity of the City of Santa Clarita if it determines, based on relevant scientific information and land use planning studies and after holding at least one public hearing, that a boundary revision is necessary, and to prepare and file a revised map showing the revised boundaries, as prescribed. This bill would, pursuant to the same process and conditions, also authorize the conservancy to revise the boundaries of the Rim of the Valley Trail Corridor in the vicinity of the City of Moorpark, and to prepare and file a revised map, as prescribed. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares both of the following: (a) The boundary of the Rim of the Valley Trail Corridor within the Santa Monica Mountains Zone should be determined exclusively upon the best scientific and resource-based information regarding trail, recreational, and environmental resources in the area. (b) Landowners, local government entities, members of the public, and other affected parties should be afforded maximum participation in the process by which the Rim of the Valley Trail Corridor is delineated. SEC. 2. Section 33204.8 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 33204.8. (a) (1) Notwithstanding the requirements in Section 33105.5, if the conservancy determines, based on relevant scientific information and land use planning studies, and after holding at least one public hearing in the area that would be affected by a revision of the boundaries of the Rim of the Valley Trail Corridor, that a boundary revision within and in the vicinity of the City of Moorpark, as described in paragraph (2), is necessary, the executive director shall prepare and file with the Secretary of State, the Assembly Committee on Natural Resources, and the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Water a revised map showing the changes in the boundaries of the Rim of the Valley Trail Corridor. (2) The conservancy shall determine potential boundary revisions of the Rim of the Valley Trail Corridor for the area within the city limits of the City of Moorpark; the area of the north of the city limits and south of Broadway Road between Happy Camp Canyon Regional Park and Grimes Canyon Road; and the area west of the city limits of the City of Moorpark, south of Los Angeles Avenue, north of the Arroyo Simi, and east of the Gabbert Canyon Drainage Channel. (3) A revised map prepared pursuant to paragraph (1) shall be supported by relevant scientific information, and shall be in accordance with the purposes and objectives of Section 33204.3. (b) Notwithstanding Section 33201, this section does not affect the jurisdiction of the State Coastal Conservancy.