Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|