|
09/16/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 381, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5874.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4645.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4689.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|