California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2197 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2016

Amended

Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016