California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2199 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 28, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016