Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/14/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1696.) | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | ||
Assembly | 12/01/2014 | Read first time. To print. |