|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5008.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4595.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|