Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |