California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2207 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 28, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016