Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 19). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |