|
08/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4873.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4787.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|