08/17/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 133, Statutes of 2016. | |||
08/17/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/05/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/02/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 4727.). | ||
Senate | 06/20/2016 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4627.) | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |