Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4463.) | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13). | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 29). | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |