|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 4959.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 11. Page 4951.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4852.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|