California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2221 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/26/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2221CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 641 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 26, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 29, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 18, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 16, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 19, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 6, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Cristina Garcia and Grove FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to add Section 236.13 to the Penal Code, relating to crimes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2221, Cristina Garcia. Criminal procedure: human trafficking witnesses. Under existing law, a person who deprives or violates another person's personal liberty with the intent to obtain forced labor or services or who deprives or violates another person's personal liberty for the purpose of prostitution or sexual exploitation is guilty of human trafficking, a felony. This bill would require, in a case involving a charge of human trafficking, that a minor who is a victim of the human trafficking be provided with assistance from the local county Victim Witness Assistance Center if the minor so desires that assistance. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 236.13 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 236.13. (a) In a case involving a charge of human trafficking under Section 236.1, a minor who is a victim of the human trafficking shall be provided with assistance from the local county Victim Witness Assistance Center if the minor so desires. (b) This section does not require a local agency to operate a Victim Witness Assistance Center.