Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 5119.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|