Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |