|
08/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2352.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1877.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1222.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|