|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 314, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6219.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4963.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4893.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|