California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2231 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016