California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2235 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016