California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB224 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015