Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |