California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2246 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill June 9, 2016
Bill March 16, 2016