BILL NUMBER: AB 2247AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Williams FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act relating to armories. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2247, as amended, Williams. Armories. Existing law authorizes the Director of General Services, with the approval of the Adjutant General, to lease and sell real property held for armory purposes, subject to legislative approval. Existing law establishes the Armory Fund and requires that the net proceeds from the sale or lease of armories be deposited into the fund, for use, upon appropriation by the Legislature, for specified purposes related to armories. Existing law authorizes the sale of specified armories. This bill would require the Director of General Services, with approval of the Adjutant General, to grant the City of Santa Barbara or the Santa Barbara Unified School District an option to purchase the Santa Barbara Armory, as specified. The bill would additionally require the director, upon expiration of the option, to offer the armory for saleby general bid.pursuant to existing law. This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the City of Santa Barbara. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) Notwithstanding Section 2 of Chapter 355 of the Statutes of 2015, the Director of General Services, with approval of the Adjutant General, shall grant to the City of Santa Barbara or the Santa Barbara Unified School District an option to purchase the Santa Barbara Armory. The option shall expire on July 1, 2017.The purchase agreement may consider the contributory value of all capital improvements made to the Santa Barbara Armory by the City of Santa Barbara less the value of improvements made in lieu of rents during the term of the use of the Santa Barbara Armory by the City of Santa Barbara, and any state costs incurred in the sale of the Santa Barbara Armory to the City of Santa Barbara or the Santa Barbara Unified School District.Any purchase agreement pursuant to this paragraph shall include terms and conditions determined by the Director of General Services to be in the best interest of the state based on the fair market value of the armory, based on the zoning as it existed on March 1, 2016, as determined by an appraisal undertaken and approved by the Director of General Services. (b) If the option granted pursuant to subdivision (a) expires, the Santa Barbara Armory shall be offered for saleby general bid. Any purchase agreement made pursuant to this paragraph shall include terms and conditions determined by the Director of General Services to be in the best interest of the state based on the fair market value of the armory as determined by an appraisal undertaken and approved by the Department of General Services.pursuant to Sections 1 and 2 of Chapter 355 of the Statutes of 2015. (c) (1) The sale of the Santa Barbara Armory shall be conducted pursuant to Section 435 of the Military and Veterans Code. (2) For the purposes of this act, the Santa Barbara Armory means the approximately3.03 acres of real property with4.7 acres of real property (APN: 031-041-001) with an approximately 27,000 square foot armory building and ancillary improvements made thereon, located at 700 E. Canon Perdido Street, Santa Barbara, California. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because ofthe current use of the Santa Barbara Armory by the Santa Barbara Unified School District andthe location of the armory in the city of Santa Barbara.