California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2247 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016