Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2016 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 5854.) Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2016 | through August 17 Motion to reconsider continued. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 4726.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Ridley-Thomas. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13). | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |