Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4389.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4389.) (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|