California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2254 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill June 8, 2016
Bill March 10, 2016