California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2258 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill March 16, 2016