California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 19, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015