07/25/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2016. | |||
07/25/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4643.). | ||
Senate | 06/13/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4689.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |