Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13). | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2015 | Read first time. To print. |