California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016