Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |