California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 8, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016