Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 4563.) | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |