California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB229 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015