California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2290 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016