|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 569, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6356.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 5268.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4782.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|