California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2296 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 9, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016