|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 735, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 6542.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 5519.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 5452.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 5242.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4218.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|