LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB23
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB23
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB23
Action History
Assembly
02/01/2016
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Assembly
01/31/2016
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
Assembly
03/23/2015
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Assembly
01/16/2015
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Assembly
12/02/2014
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
Assembly
12/01/2014
Read first time. To print.