Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |