Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 12). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |