California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2306 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill May 10, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016