LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2309
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2309
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2309
Action History
Assembly
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Assembly
04/12/2016
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
03/29/2016
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Assembly
03/03/2016
Referred to Com. on JUD.
Assembly
02/19/2016
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
Assembly
02/18/2016
Read first time. To print.