California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2309 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/18/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2309INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Gallagher and Dodd (Principal coauthor: Senator Nielsen) FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act relating to the County of Colusa, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2309, as introduced, Gallagher. Court facilities: County of Colusa. Existing law establishes the State Court Facilities Construction Fund for the planning, design, construction, rehabilitation, renovation, replacement, leasing, or acquisition of court facilities. Existing law levies a state court construction penalty on every criminal offense, as specified, to be deposited into the fund. Existing law requires, with specified exceptions, that 25% of moneys collected from a county for the fund be designated for implementation of trial court projects in that county. Existing law authorizes the board of supervisors to establish in the county treasury a Courthouse Construction Fund into which shall be deposited the amounts specified in the resolutions adopted by the board of supervisors, for the purpose of rehabilitating existing courtrooms, an existing courtroom building or buildings, or court facilities, for other uses if a new courtroom, a courtroom building or buildings, or court facilities are acquired, constructed, or financed. Existing law requires that any amount in a county's courthouse construction fund be transferred to the State Court Facilities Construction Fund at the later of specified dates. This bill would transfer $844,000 of the amount that was held in the Courthouse Construction Fund for the County of Colusa on December 31, 2009, to the State Court Facilities Construction Fund, and would appropriate that amount to the Judicial Council for the purpose of constructing or renovating facilities, as specified, located within the courthouse building in the County of Colusa that was transferred to state responsibility on March 24, 2009. This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the County of Colusa. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Notwithstanding any other law, eight hundred forty-four thousand dollars ($844,000) of the amount remaining in the fund established by Section 76100 of the Government Code for the County of Colusa and held in that fund on December 31, 2009, shall be transferred to the State Court Facilities Construction Fund and appropriated to the Judicial Council for the purpose of constructing or renovating facilities located within the courthouse building in the County of Colusa that was transferred to state responsibility on March 24, 2009. These funds also may be used for the construction or renovation of facilities to be utilized by the probation department of the County of Colusa, provided that facilities that are located within the courthouse building, but occupied exclusively by the probation department on or before January 1, 2016, are transferred to the state for use as court facilities upon completion of the construction or renovation. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique circumstances in the County of Colusa, including that there are funds remaining in the county's courthouse construction fund.